Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9526
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9526
Title:Jimcy McGirt, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:June 7, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-1057)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 8, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jimcy McGirt.
Blanket Consent
Jul 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 19 2019Response Requested. (Due August 19, 2019)
Aug 19 2019Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 13 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Dec 13 2019Letter regarding appearance of counsel of Jimcy McGirt submitted.
Main Document
Dec 16 2019Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Jimcy McGirt.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jan 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 4, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including March 13, 2020.
Jan 08 2020Motion to appoint counsel DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 17 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jimcy McGirt.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Oklahoma submitted.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Jimcy McGirt
Jimcy McGirt#178480
216 North Murray Street
Unit 5
Helena, OK 73741-1018

Party name: Jimcy McGirt
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543