Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-949
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-949
Title:Jamal Knox, Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:January 22, 2019
Linked with 18A492
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Western District
   Case Numbers:(3 WAP 2017)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2018Application (18A492) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 19, 2018 to January 18, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 07 2018Application (18A492) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 18, 2019.
Jan 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jamal Knox.
Blanket Consent
Jan 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 04 2019Response Requested. (Due March 6, 2019)
Feb 28 2019Brief of respondent Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in opposition filed.
Main Document
Mar 05 2019Affidavit of service and certificate of word count filed with respect to brief in opposition of respondent Pennsylvania.
Proof of ServiceOther
Mar 06 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute and The Rutherford Institute.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Michael Render ("Killer Mike"),Erik Nielson, and Other Artists and Scholars and other Artists and Scholars.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 06 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Art Scholars and Historians.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 12 2019Reply of petitioner Jamal Knox filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Michael Render, et al. GRANTED.
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers GRANTED.
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al. GRANTED.
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Art Scholars and Historians GRANTED.
Apr 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Stanton Jones
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

Stanton.Jones@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5563
Party name: Jamal Knox
Attorneys for Respondent
Francesco L. Nepa
    Counsel of Record
Allegheny County Office of the District Attorney
401 Allegheny County Courthouse
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

fnepa@da.allegheny.pa.us
412-350-4377
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Other
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

erin.murphy@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Art Scholars and Historians
Ari Joseph Savitzky
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pensylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

ari.savitzky@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Cato Institute and The Rutherford Institute
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Ellyde Roko Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

ellydethompson@quinnemanuel.com
212-849-7344
Party name: MICHAEL RENDER (“KILLER MIKE”), ERIK NIELSON, AND OTHER ARTISTS AND SCHOLARS

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543