Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-942
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-942
Title:Ashidda Forgus, Petitioner
v.
Mark T. Esper, Secretary of Defense
Docketed:January 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1113)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2019.
Mar 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2019 to April 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 22, 2019.
Apr 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 6, 2019.
May 06 2019Brief of respondent Shanahan, Patrick in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
May 22 2019Reply of petitioner Ashidda Forgus filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 19 2019Rescheduled.
Sep 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jul 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Gregory Crowley
    Counsel of Record
Crowley & Crowley, P.C.
4870 Sadler Road
Suite 300
Glen Allen, VA 23060

scrowley@crowleyandcrowley.com
8042055010
Party name: Ashidda Forgus
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Mark T. Esper, Secretary of Defense

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543