Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9399
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9399
Title:Paul Johnson, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15690)
   Decision Date:April 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 24, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixOtherProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jun 14 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Paul Johnson, Jr.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Brief amici curiae of Downsize DC Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2019Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2019)
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2019 to September 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1 East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

andrew_adler@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Paul Johnson, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Downsize DC Foundation, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543