Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-936
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-936
Title:Jeremy Kettler, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3035)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2019.
Feb 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Kansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Downsize DC Foundation, et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2019 to April 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 22, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

rob@wjopc.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Jeremy Kettler
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Toby Crouse
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General Derek Schmidt
120 S.W. 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

toby.crouse@ag.ks.gov
785.296.2215
Party name: Kansas, et al.
J. Mark Brewer
    Counsel of Record
Brewer, Pritchard & Buckley, PC
770 S. Post Oak Ln.
Suite 620
Houston, TX 77056

brewer@bplaw.com
7132092910
Party name: Downsize DC Foundation, et al

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543