Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9343
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9343
Title:Joe Carroll Ziglar, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 20, 2019
Linked with 18A881
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16055, 17-13798)
   Decision Date:December 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2019Application (18A881) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 11, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Feb 28 2019Application (18A881) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 10, 2019.
May 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 19, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Jun 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2019 to July 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 19, 2019.
Jul 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 19, 2019 to August 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 19, 2019.
Aug 19 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 05 2019Reply of petitioner Joe Ziglar filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mackenzie S Lund
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders Middle District of Alabama
817 South Court Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

Mackenzie_S_Lund@fd.org
334-834-2099
Party name: Joe Ziglar
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543