Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-929
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-929
Title:Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rae Weiler
Docketed:January 17, 2019
Linked with 18A450
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Fourth Appellate District, Division Three
   Case Numbers:(G053953)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 15, 2018

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2018Application (18A450) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2018 to December 13, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Application (18A450) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 13, 2018.
Nov 26 2018Application (18A450) to extend further the time from December 13, 2018 to January 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written RequestProof of Service
Nov 28 2018Application (18A450) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 12, 2019.
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2019Waiver of right of respondent Rae Weiler to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The California Building Industry Association, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Feb 27 2019Response Requested. (Due March 29, 2019)
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2019 to April 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2019.
Apr 29 2019Brief of respondent Rae Weiler in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 14 2019Reply of petitioners Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The California Building Industry Assn., et al. GRANTED.
Jun 03 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alexander Dushku
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
36 South State Street
Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

adushku@kmclaw.com
8013283600
Party name: Marcus & Millichap Real Estate Investment Services, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Rae Weiler
Cornelius P. BahanCornelius P. Bahan, Inc.
113 Avenida Granada
San Clemente, CA 92672

949-622-0200
Party name: Rae Weiler
Other
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: THE CALIFORNIA BUILDING INDUSTRY ASSN., THE CALIFORNIA BUSINESS PROPERTIES ASSOCIATION, THE CALIFORNIA MANUFACTURERS & TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION, CITIZENS AGAINST LAWSUIT ABUSE, LION REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543