Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9261
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9261
Title:Calmer Cottier, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3690)
   Decision Date:November 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 14, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 29 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 10 2019Response Requested. (Due July 10, 2019)
Jul 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 10, 2019 to August 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 9, 2019.
Aug 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2019 to September 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 9, 2019.
Sep 09 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Reply of petitioner Calmer Cottier filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Sep 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 07 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 15 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 04 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 12 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 19 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 09 2019Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nathaniel Forrest Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Law
1209 Junction Avenue
Sturgis, SD 57785

nate@nelsonlawsturgis.com
605-561-6283
Party name: Calmer Cottier
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543