Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9244
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9244
Title:Danny Herrera, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 13, 2019
Linked with 18A971
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-13508)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2019Application (18A971) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 10, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 26 2019Application (18A971) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 10, 2019.
May 09 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 12, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2019 to July 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2019.
Jul 12 2019Memorandum of respondent United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 26 2019Reply of petitioner Danny Herrera filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherOtherOtherOtherOtherProof of Service
Aug 01 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Ann Brewerton-Palmer
    Counsel of Record
Caplan Cobb LLP
75 Fourteenth Street NE, Suite 2750
Atlanta, GA 30309

spalmer@caplancobb.com
404-596-5609
Party name: Danny Herrera
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543