Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-923
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-923
Title:Carol Coghlan Carter, Next Friend of A. D., C. C., L. G., and C. R., et al., Petitioners
v.
Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney, Assistant Secretary of Bureau of Indian Affairs, et al.
Docketed:January 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15839)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 15, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019Waiver of right of respondents Gila River Indian Community; and Navajo Nation to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 15, 2019 to March 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2019.
Feb 26 2019Waiver of right of respondent Gregory McKay, Director of Arizona Department of Child Safety to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2019 to April 17, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 17, 2019.
Apr 17 2019Brief of respondents Tara Katuk Mac Lean Sweeney, Assistant Secretary of Bureau of Indian Affairs, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 03 2019Reply of petitioners Carol Coghlan Carter, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Aditya Dynar
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
Goldwater Institute
500 East Coronado Road, AZ 85004

adynar@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Carol Coghlan Carter, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
2005 North Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
6025423333
Party name: Gregory McKay, Director of Arizona Department of Child Safety
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Sweeney, Tara Katuk Mac Lean, et al.
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Gila River Indian Community; and Navajo Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543