Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-921
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-921
Title:Roman Catholic Archdiocese of San Juan, Puerto Rico, et al., Petitioners
v.
Yali Acevedo Feliciano, et al.
Docketed:January 16, 2019
Linked with 17A1375, 18A483
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Puerto Rico
   Case Numbers:(CC-2018-0475)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 17, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2018Application (17A1375) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentOther
Jun 15 2018Response to application (17A1375) requested by Justice Breyer, due Wednesday, June 20, 2018, by 3 p.m. ET.
Jun 19 2018Response to application from respondent Yalí Acevedo Feliciano, et al. filed.
Main Document
Jun 20 2018Response in support of the application from respondent Catholic Employees Pension Trust filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2018Reply of applicant Roman Catholic Archdiocese of San Juan, Puerto Rico, et al. filed.
ReplyReplyProof of Service
Jun 21 2018Application (17A1375) denied by Justice Breyer.
Jun 22 2018Application (17A1375) refiled and submitted to Justice Alito.
Written Request
Jun 22 2018Application (17A1375) denied by Justice Alito.
Nov 02 2018Application (18A483) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 15, 2018 to December 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Application (18A483) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until December 15, 2018.
Dec 06 2018Application (18A483) to extend further the time from December 15, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 07 2018Application (18A483) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until January 14, 2019.
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Suggestion of bankruptcy of petitioner received from counsel for respondents Yali, Acevedo Feliciano, et al. received.
Feb 01 2019Brief of respondents Yalí Acevedo Feliciano, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Roman Catholic Archdiocese of San Juan, Puerto Rico, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 07 2019Letter of February 5, 2019 received from counsel for Academia del Perpetuo Socorro and Academia San Jose.
Feb 15 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 15 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 15 2019Brief of respondents Academia del Perpetuo Socorro; Academia San Jose in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Brief of respondent Catholic Employees Pension Trust in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 06 2019Reply of petitioners Roman Catholic Archdiocese of San Juan, Puerto Rico, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019Letter of March 20, 2019 with additional authority from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOther
Mar 20 2019Letter of March 20, 2019 from counsel for respondents received. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherOther
Mar 21 2019Letter of March 21, 2019 from counsel for respondents received. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOther
Mar 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
May 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 06 2019Letter of May 29, 2019 from counsel for respondents received. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOther
Jun 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Roman Catholic Archdiocese of San Juan, Puerto Rico, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Yalí Acevedo Feliciano, et al.
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Academia del Perpetuo Socorro; Academia San Jose
Frank Zorrilla
    Counsel of Record
Frank Zorrilla Law Office
PO Box 191783
San Juan, PR 00919

fzorrilla@fzmlaw.com
7873121510
Party name: Catholic Employees Pension Trust
German Jose Brau-RamirezBauza Brau Irizarry Ojeda Silva
PO BOX 13669
San Juan, PR 00908

german.brau@bioslawpr.com
7877108262
Party name: Yalí Acevedo Feliciano, et al.
Other
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention
Eugene Scalia
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

escalia@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8206
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543