Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-918
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-918
Title:John Copeland, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., et al.
Docketed:January 16, 2019
Linked with 18A433
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-474)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 16, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 22 2018Application (18A433) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 14, 2018 to January 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 25 2018Application (18A433) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until January 13, 2019.
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Waiver of right of respondent New York City D.A. Cyrus R. Vance, Jr. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 15 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Legal Aid Society. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Criminal Law Professors, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Feb 27 2019Response Requested. (Due March 29, 2019)
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2019, for all respondents.
May 13 2019Brief of respondent City of New York in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2019Brief of respondent Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., New York County District Attorney in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2019Reply of petitioners John Copeland, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 04 2019Letter of June 4, 2019 on behalf of respondents filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Supplemental brief of petitioners John Copeland, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2019Supplemental brief of respondents City of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Legal Aid Society GRANTED.
Jun 17 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Criminal Law Professors, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 17 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Law Scholars GRANTED.
Jun 17 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel L. Schmutter
    Counsel of Record
Hartman & Winnicki, P.C.
74 Passaic Street
Ridgewood, NJ 07450

dschmutter@hartmanwinnicki.com
201-967-8040
Party name: John Copeland, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: City of New York
Elizabeth Norris Krasnow
    Counsel of Record
New York County District Attorney's Office
One Hogan Place
New York, NY 10013

krasnowe@dany.nyc.gov
2123354210
Party name: New York City D.A. Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.
Elizabeth N. KrasnowNew York County District Attorney's Office
One Hogan Place
New York, NY 10012

krasnow@dany.nyc.gov
212-335-4210
Party name: New York City D.A. Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.
Devin Andrew SlackNew York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

dslack@law.nyc.gov
212-356-0817
Party name: City of New York
Other
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Criminal Law Professors and Cato Institute
Richard Joselson
    Counsel of Record
The Legal Aid Society
199 Water Street
New York, NY 10038

rjoselson@legal-aid.org
212-577-3451
Party name: The Legal Aid Society
Sarah M. Shalf
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
Gambrell Hall
1301 Clifton Road NE
Atlanta, GA 30322-2770

sarah.shalf@emory.edu
404-712-4652
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543