Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-911
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-911
Title:Intermountain Health Care, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, ex rel. Gerald Polukoff, et al.
Docketed:January 14, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4014)
   Decision Date:July 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Waiver of right of respondent Gerald Polukoff to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 04 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
M. Miller Baker
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbaker@mwe.com
703-927-3938
Party name: Intermountain Health Care, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620638
Party name: Gerald Polukoff
Other
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: American Hospital Association and Federation of American Hospitals

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543