Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9071
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9071
Title:Jason Moody, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 1, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10361)
   Decision Date:January 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 31, 2019)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
May 17 2019Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rehaif v. United States, 588 U. S. ___ (2019).
Jul 30 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Joel Page
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
525 S. Griffin Street
Suite 629
Dallas, TX 75202

joel_page@fd.org
214-767-2746
Party name: Jason Moody
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543