SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-9032
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-9032
Title:
Michael Slager, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
April 30, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-4036)
Decision Date:
January 8, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
February 5, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 30, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 10 2019
Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
May 15 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Anne Franklin-Best
Counsel of Record
Blume Franklin-Best & Young, LLC
900 Elmwood Ave.
Suite 200
Columbia, SC 29201
betsy@blumelaw.com
803-765-1044
Party name: Slager Michael
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##