Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-894
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-894
Title:Harold McNeal, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Navajo Nation, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2019
Linked with 18A582
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2205)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 30 2018Application (18A582) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2018 to January 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Application (18A582) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 10, 2019.
Jan 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2019)
PetitionPetitionPetition
Jan 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 11, 2019 to March 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 13, 2019.
Mar 13 2019Brief of respondents Navajo Nation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 12 2019Rescheduled.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondents
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5600
Party name: Navajo Nation, et al.
Nicholas Mark Sydow
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Mexico Attorney General
201 Third St., Suite 300
Albuquerque, NM 87102

nsydow@nmag.gov
505-717-3571
Party name: Hon. Bradford J. Dalley

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543