Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-893
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-893
Vide 18-1189
Title:West Virginia House of Delegates, Petitioner
v.
West Virginia, ex rel. Margaret L. Workman, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia
   Case Numbers:(18-0816)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 11 2019Waiver of right of respondent Margaret L. Workman to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 24 2019Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2019)
May 24 2019Brief of respondent West Virginia ex rel. Margaret L. Workman in opposition filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2019Reply of petitioner West Virginia House of Delegates filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Anthony Carter
    Counsel of Record
Dinsmore and Shohl, LLP
707 Virginia St E
Suite 1300
Charleston, WV 25301

mark.carter@dinsmore.com
304.357.0900
Party name: West Virginia House of Delegates
Attorneys for Respondents
Marc Ellis Williams
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins
949 3rd Avenue, Suite 200
Huntington, WV 25701

marc.williams@nelsonmullins.com
304-526-3501
Party name: Margaret L. Workman

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543