Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8855
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8855
Title:Eric A. Hicks, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 16, 2019
Linked with 18A863
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3005)
   Decision Date:December 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2019Application (18A863) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2019 to April 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. (The Chief Justice is recused.)
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Application (18A863) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 27, 2019.
Apr 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
May 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul S. Rosenzweig
    Counsel of Record
509 C Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

paulrosenzweigesq@gmail.com
2025470660
Party name: Eric Hicks
Paul S. Rosenzweig
    Counsel of Record
509 C Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

paulrosenzweigesq@gmail.com
2025470660
Party name: Eric Hicks
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543