Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8845 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8845 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Abel Revill Ochoa, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:April 16, 2019
Linked with 18A839
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-70016)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2019Application (18A839) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 28, 2019 to April 15, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Application (18A839) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 15, 2019.
Apr 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2019 to June 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2019.
Jun 12 2019Brief of respondent Davis, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 12 2019Reply of petitioner Abel Revill Ochoa filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Don Schepers
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender. Northem District of Texas
525 S. Griffin St., Ste. 629
Dallas, TX 75202

jeremy_schepers@fd.org
12147672746
Party name: Abel Revill Ochoa
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Matthew Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711

stephen.hoffman@oag.texas.gov
512-936-6388
Party name: Davis, Dir., TX DCJ

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543