Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8844 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8844 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Farris G. Morris, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:April 16, 2019
Linked with 18A805
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5626)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2019Application (18A805) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2019 to April 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 08 2019Application (18A805) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 12, 2019.
Apr 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jun 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Tennent
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
810 Broadway
Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

Richard_Tennent@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: Farris Genner Morris
Attorneys for Respondent
John Henry Bledsoe III
    Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
P. O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

John.Bledsoe@ag.tn.gov
6157414351
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543