Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-881
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-881
Title:American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jane O’Keeffe, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2019
Linked with 18A518
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35834)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2018Application (18A518) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 6, 2018 to January 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Application (18A518) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 7, 2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, et al..
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jane O'Keeffe, et al.(collectively, "the Oregon respondents").
Blanket Consent
Jan 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 08 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Western States Petroleum Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2019 to April 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2019, for all respondents.
Apr 05 2019Brief of Oregon respondents and the State of Washington in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent California Air Resources Board to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2019Waiver of right of respondents Oregon Environmental Council, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 22 2019Reply of petitioners American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul J. Zidlicky
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

pzidlicky@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Amanda W. Goodin
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
705 Second Avenue, Suite 203
Seattle, WA 98104

Agoodin@earthjustice.org
206-343-7340
Party name: Oregon Environmental Council, et al.
Amanda W. Goodin
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
705 Second Avenue, Suite 203
Seattle, WA 98104

Agoodin@earthjustice.org
206-343-7340
Party name: Climate Solutions
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Oregon
1162 Court St NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
5033784402
Party name: Jane O'Keeffe, et al.
Margaret Elaine Meckenstock
    Counsel of Record
Office of the California Attorney General
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Elaine.Meckenstock@doj.ca.gov
510-879-0299
Party name: California Air Resources Board
Other
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
2026396518
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and The National Association of Manufacturers
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Louisiana, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas and Utah
Kevin Murray Fong
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury
Four Embarcadero Center, 22nd Floor
P.O. Box 2824
San Francisco, CA 94126

kevin.fong@pillsburylaw.com
415.983.1270
Party name: Western States Petroleum Association and American Petroleum Institute
Ryan G. Koopmans
    Counsel of Record
Belin McCormick, PC
666 Walnut Street
Suite 2000
Des Moines, IA 50309

rkoopmans@belinmccormick.com
515-283-4617
Party name: Law Professors
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Cato Institute, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Committee for a Constructive Tomorrow, Institute for Energy Research, Energy and Environment Legal Institute, 60 Plus Foundation, and Capital Research Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543