Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8739
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8739
Title:Armando Lopez, Petitioner
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:April 9, 2019
Linked with 18A762
Lower Ct:Appeals Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(17-P-1101)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 8, 2018

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 23 2019Application (18A762) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2019 to March 8, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 24 2019Application (18A762) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until March 8, 2019.
Feb 25 2019Application (18A762) to extend further the time from March 8, 2019 to April 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Written RequestProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Application (18A762) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until April 8, 2019.
Apr 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 9, 2019)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts to respond filed.
Main Document
May 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 09 2019Response Requested. (Due June 10, 2019)
May 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2019 to August 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 9, 2019.
Jul 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2019 to September 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 9, 2019.
Sep 09 2019Brief of respondent Massachusetts in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Reply of petitioner Armando Lopez filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Armando Lopez
Attorneys for Respondent
Dean A. Mazzone
    Counsel of Record
Massachusetts Attorney General's Office
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

Dean.Mazzone@state.ma.us
617 727 2200
Party name: Massachusetts

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543