Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-873
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-873
Title:Casino Pauma, Petitioner
v.
National Labor Relations Board
Docketed:January 8, 2019
Linked with 18A325
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70397, 16-70756)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2018Application (18A325) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 5, 2018 to January 4, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 28 2018Application (18A325) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 4, 2019.
Jan 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2019.
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2019 to April 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2019.
Apr 10 2019Brief of respondent National Labor Relations Board in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 26 2019Reply of petitioner Casino Pauma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Michael Cochrane
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Cochrane, LLP
28581 Old Town Front Street
Temecula, CA 92590

kmc@williamscochrane.com
6197934809
Party name: Casino Pauma
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: National Labor Relations Board

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543