Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8712 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8712 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:John Hummel, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:April 5, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-70004)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 6, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2019 to June 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 5, 2019.
May 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2019 to July 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2019.
Jul 03 2019Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Mowla
    Counsel of Record
Michael Mowla
P.O. Box 868
Cedar Hill, TX 75106

michael@mowlalaw.com
972-795-2401
Party name: John Hummel
Attorneys for Respondent
Tina J. Miranda
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General
300 W. 15th Street
8th Floor
Austin, TX 78701

tina.miranda@oag.texas.gov
5129361400
Party name: Lorie Davis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543