Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-854
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-854
Title:George Alvarez, Petitioner
v.
City of Brownsville, Texas
Docketed:January 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-40772)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Brownsville, Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 22 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 31 2019Response Requested. (Due March 4, 2019)
Feb 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2019 to April 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 4, 2019.
Mar 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2019 to May 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2019.
May 01 2019Brief of respondent City of Brownsville, Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eduardo Lucio
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Eddie Lucio
834 E. Tyler Street
Brownsville, TX 78520

elucio@luciolaw.com
956-546-9400
Party name: George Alvarez
Attorneys for Respondent
Ramon G. Viada III
    Counsel of Record
Viada & Strayer
17 Swallow Tail Ct.
The Woodlands, TX 77381

rayviada@viadastrayer.com
281-419-6338
Party name: City of Brownsville, Texas
Other
Thomas William McGee III
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough, LLP
1320 Main Street
17th Floor
Columbia, SC 29201

billy.mcgee@nelsonmullins.com
803799-2000
Party name: Law Professors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543