Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8447
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8447
Title:Javis Wilson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10652)
   Decision Date:December 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 17, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Apr 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2019 to May 17, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2019.
May 09 2019Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 21 2019Reply of petitioner Javis Wilson filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 29 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 10 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 27 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Javis Wilson filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Javis Wilson#68606-018
FCI, P.O. Box 1032
Coleman, FL 33521

Party name: Javis Wilson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543