Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-843
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-843
Title:Ivan Pena, et al., Petitioners
v.
Martin Horan, Director, California Department of Justice Bureau of Firearms
Docketed:January 3, 2019
Linked with 18A178
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15449)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2018Application (18A178) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2018 to December 31, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Application (18A178) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 31, 2018.
Dec 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 4, 2019 to March 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 6, 2019.
Feb 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief of respondent Martin Horan, Director, California Department of Justice Bureau of Firearms in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Reply of Ivan Pena, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Ivan Pena, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3896
Party name: Martin Horan
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: STATES OF TEXAS, ALABAMA, ALASKA, ARKANSAS, FLORIDA, GEORGIA, IDAHO, INDIANA, KANSAS, LOUISIANA, MISSOURI, NEBRASKA, OHIO, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTH DAKOTA, UTAH, WEST VIRGINIA, AND THE COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
303-279-6536
Party name: PROFESSORS OF SECOND AMENDMENT LAW, CITIZENS COMMITTEE FOR THE RIGHT TO KEEP AND BEAR ARMS, MOUNTAIN STATES LEGAL FOUNDATION, JEWS FOR THE PRESERVATION OF FIREARMS OWNERSHIP, INDEPENDENCE INSTITUTE, AND MILLENNIAL POLICY CENTER
George Montgomery Lee
    Counsel of Record
Seiler Epstein Ziegler & Applegate LLP
601 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000
San Francisco, CA 94111

gml@sezalaw.com
415 979 0500
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Firearms Policy Foundation, Madison Society Foundation, Inc., San Diego County Gun Owners, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees, Inc., and Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543