Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8380
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8380
Title:Woodrow Pressey, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 12, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12268-GG)
   Decision Date:December 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2019.
May 09 2019Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 29 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 10 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adeel Mohammad Bashir
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Defender for the Middle District of Florida
400 N. Tampa Street, Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

adeel_bashir@fd.org
703-835-3929
Party name: Woodrow Pressey, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543