Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-837
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-837
Title:Scott Harris, in His Official Capacity as State Health Officer, et al., Petitioners
v.
West Alabama Women's Center, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2019
Linked with 18A472
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15208)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2018Application (18A472) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 20, 2018 to December 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Application (18A472) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 20, 2018.
Dec 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Application of West Alabama Women's Center, et al. for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (December 28, 2018 - request submitted under the wrong docket number)
Jan 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 4, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2019.
Jan 18 2019Brief amici curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2019Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Moral Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Trinity Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Christian Medical & Dental Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief of respondents West Alabama Women's Center, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 15 2019Reply of petitioners Steven T. Marshall, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 09 2019Rescheduled.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 16 2019Rescheduled.
Apr 22 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
Apr 24 2019Rescheduled.
May 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 08 2019Rescheduled.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 15 2019Rescheduled.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 21 2019Rescheduled.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 29 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 05 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 12 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, concurring in the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James William Davis
    Counsel of Record
State of Alabama, Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36104

jimdavis@ago.state.al.us
334-242-7300
Party name: Steven T. Marshall, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew D. Beck
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

abeck@aclu.org
212-549-2633
Party name: West Alabama Women's Center, et al.
Other
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, Inc.
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law, Personhood Alabama, and The Adoption Law Firm
Mary Elizabeth McAlister
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 11108
Lynchburg, VA 24506

mary@lc.org
434-592-7000
Party name: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PRO-LIFE OBSTETRICIANS & GYNECOLOGISTS AND AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PEDIATRICIANS
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana, et al.
Linda Boston Schlueter
    Counsel of Record
Trinity Legal Center
11120 Wurzbach, Suite 206
San Antonio, TX 78230

TLC4Linda@aol.com
210-697-8202
Party name: Trinity Legal Center
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(757)226-2749
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Kevin Hayden Theriot
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

ktheriot@ADFlegal.org
480-444-0020
Party name: Christian Medical & Dental Associations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543