Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8332 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8332 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Tony Parker, Commissioner, Tennessee Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:March 8, 2019
Linked with 18A709
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Tennessee, Middle Division
   Case Numbers:(M2018-01385-SC-RDO-CV)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2018Application (18A709) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 6, 2019 to March 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 09 2019Application (18A709) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 7, 2019.
Mar 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Apr 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Conservatives Concerned About the Death Penalty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2019Brief of respondent Tony Parker, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 23 2019Reply of petitioners Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert N. Hochman
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

rhochman@sidley.com
312-853-2936
Party name: Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Amy L. Tarkington
    Counsel of Record
Tennessee Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

amy.tarkington@ag.tn.gov
6157412216
Party name: Tony Parker, et al.
Other
Eric G. Osborne
    Counsel of Record
Sherrard Roe Voigt & Harbison, PLC
150 3rd Avenue South, Ste. 1100
Nashville, TN 37201

eosborne@srvhlaw.com
615-742-4200
Party name: Conservatives Concerned About the Death Penalty

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543