Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-824
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-824
Title:Thomas Rogers, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gurbir Grewal, Attorney General of New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:January 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2366)
   Decision Date:September 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Thomas Rogers, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Thomas Rogers, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543