Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8029 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8029 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Charles Russell Rhines, Petitioner
v.
Darin Young, Warden
Docketed:February 21, 2019
Linked with 18A612
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2376)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 18, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2018Application (18A612) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 17, 2018 to February 15, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Dec 11 2018Application (18A612) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until February 15, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 25, 2019)
OtherPetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Mar 13 2019Brief of respondent Darin Young in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherOther
Mar 22 2019Reply of petitioner Charles Rhines filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Mar 25 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors.
Main DocumentOtherOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Motion of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (April 09, 2019 -- Corrected version submitted)
Mar 25 2019Response of Darin Young to motion not accepted for filing. (April 11, 2019 -- Paper version not received)
Mar 26 2019Response of Darin Young to motion not accepted for filing. (April 11, 2019 -- Paper version not received)
Mar 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Law Professors GRANTED.
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. GRANTED.
Apr 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Civil Liberties Union, et al. GRANTED.
Apr 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Claudia VanWyk
    Counsel of Record
Federal Community Defender Office for the Eastern
601 Walnut Street, Suite 545 W
Philadelphia, PA 19106

claudia_vanwyk@fd.org
215-928-0520
Party name: Charles Rhines
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul S. Swedlund
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General Office
Office of the Attorney General
1302 E. Highway 14, Suite 1
Pierre, SD 57501-8501

paul.swedlund@state.sd.us
6057735402
Party name: Darin Young
Other
Daniel Scott Harawa
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
700 14th Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

dharawa@naacpldf.org
2026821300
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Richard D. Snyder
    Counsel of Record
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
200 S. Sixth Street
Suite 4000
Minneapolis, MN 55402

rsnyder@fredlaw.com
612-492-7145
Party name: Law Professors
Ria Tabacco Mar
    Counsel of Record
ACLU
ACLU
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2400

rmar@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543