Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-801
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-801
Title:Laura Peter, Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner
v.
NantKwest, Inc.
Docketed:December 21, 2018
Linked with 18A369
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1794)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2018Application (18A369) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 25, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2018Application (18A369) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 23, 2018.
Nov 13 2018Application (18A369) to extend further the time from November 23, 2018 to December 21, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Proof of ServiceWritten Request
Nov 14 2018Application (18A369) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 21, 2018.
Dec 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2019)
PetitionProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Brief of respondent NantKwest, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Reply of petitioner Andrei Iancu filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Mar 26 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 17, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 15, 2019.
May 08 2019Letter of substitution of petitioner received.
Main Document
May 17 2019Brief of petitioner Laura Peter, Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office, filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 17 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 7, 2019.
Jul 15 2019Brief of respondent NantKwest, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Brief amici curiae of The Association of Amicus Counsel, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Association of the Bar of the City of New York filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of IEEE-USA filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2019CIRCULATED
Aug 14 2019Reply of petitioner Laura Peter, Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Aug 27 2019Complete record located on PACER (U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit and U.S.D.C. Eastern Dist, VA).
Oct 07 2019Argued. For petitioner: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Mr. Morgan Chu, Los Angeles, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Laura Peter, Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office
Attorneys for Respondent
Morgan Chu
    Counsel of Record
Irell & Manella
1800 Avenue of the Stars
Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

MChu@Irell.com
3102771010
Party name: NantKwest, Inc.
Other
William Paul Atkins
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1650 Tysons Boulevard
14th Floor
Mclean, VA 22102

william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com
703-770-7900
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Gregory Andrew Castanias
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

gcastanias@jonesday.com
2028793639
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Theodore H. Davis Jr.Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com
4048156534
Party name: The American Bar Association
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute
Margaret M. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
444 W. Lake Street
Suite 4000
Chicago, IL 60606

mduncan@mwe.com
(312) 372-2000
Party name: The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Philip Laurence Hirschhorn
    Counsel of Record
Buchanan lngersoll & Rooney PC
640 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

philip.hirschhorn@bipc.com
212-440-4400
Party name: Association of the Bar of the City of New York
Jeffrey I. D. Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

jeffrey.lewis@nortonrosefulbright.com
1-212-318-3363
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Assoc.
Charles Robert Macedo
    Counsel of Record
Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

cmacedo@arelaw.com
212-336-8000
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Charles E. Miller
    Counsel of Record
The Association of Amicus Counsel
228 East 45th Street, Suite 605
New York, NY 10017

charles.miller@cmilleriplaw.com
212-419-5210
Party name: The Association of Amicus Counsel, InfoTech Law Offices, Isshiki & Co., and Law Offices of Hiraide & Takahashi
Richard Alan Neifeld
    Counsel of Record
Neifeld IP Law, PC
5400 Shawnee Road
Alexandria, VA 22312

rneifeld@neifeld.com
7034150012
Party name: IEEE-USA
Lawrence K. Nodine
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr, LLP
999 Peachtree St., NE
Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA 30309

nodinel@ballardspahr.com
(678) 420-9422
Party name: The International Trademark Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543