Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7833
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7833
Title:Jerome Hayes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14692)
   Decision Date:November 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 11, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Mar 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2019 to April 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 10, 2019.
Apr 10 2019Response to petition from respondent United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 06 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Margaret Yvonne Foldes
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1 E. Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

margaret_foldes@fd.org
9543567436
Party name: Jerome Hayes
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543