Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7797
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7797
Title:Coree Patrick, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14989)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 8, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2019 to April 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2019.
Apr 08 2019Response to petition from respondent United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 06 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barbara Sanders
    Counsel of Record
Sanders and Duncan, P.A.
P.O. Box 157
Apalachicola, FL 32329

bsanders@fairpoint.net
8506538976
Party name: Coree Patrick
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543