Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-776
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-776
Vide 18-1015
Title:Pedro Pablo Guerrero-Lasprilla, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:December 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-60333)
   Decision Date:September 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendix
Dec 10 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jan 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2019 to February 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2019.
Feb 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 21, 2019.
Mar 21 2019Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main Document
May 23 2019Reply of petitioner Pedro Pablo Guerrero-Lasprilla filed.
Main Document
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 18-1015 is granted limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jun 24 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 18-776. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 18-776. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jun 24 2019As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions. VIDED. (September 4, 2019).
Jul 11 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Jul 16 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 21, 2019. VIDED.
Aug 29 2019Joint appendix filed. VIDED. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2019Brief of petitioner Pedro Pablo Guerrero-Lasprilla filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2019Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Habeas Corpus Law filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2019Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Council, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Liberties Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 9, 2019. VIDED.
Oct 21 2019Brief of William P. Barr, Attorney General submitted.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Pedro Pablo Guerrero-Lasprilla
Mario Rene UrizarPrada Urizar PLLC
3191 Coral Way, Ste. 607
Miami, FL 33145

murizar@pradaurizar.com
305-790-3982
Party name: Pedro Pablo Guerrero-Lasprilla
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William P. Barr, Attorney General
Other
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
6175266000
Party name: American Immigration Council, et al.
Lee Gelernt
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad St.
New York, NY 10004-2400

lgelernt@aclu.org
2125492616
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
2029558500
Party name: Scholars of Habeas Corpus Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543