Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-77
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-77
Title:Advanced Video Technologies LLC, Petitioner
v.
HTC Corporation, et al.
Docketed:July 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2309, 2016-2310, 2016-2311)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 16, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2018 to September 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 17, 2018
Aug 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Eric Maidla filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 17 2018Brief of respondents HTC Corporation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2018Reply of petitioner Advanced Video Technologies LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert William Morris
    Counsel of Record
Eckert Seamans Cherin and Mellott, LLC
10 Bank Street
White Plains, NY 10606

rwmorris@eckertseamans.com
9149492909
Party name: Advanced Video Technologies LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Heidi Lyn Keefe
    Counsel of Record
Cooley, LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

hkeefe@cooley.com
650-843-5000
Party name: HTC Corporation, et al.
Kyle D. ChenCooley LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130

kyle.chen@cooley.com
(650) 843-5019
Party name: HTC Corporation, et al.
Other
Malcolm Edwin Whittaker
    Counsel of Record
Whittaker Law Firm
2341 Glen Haven Boulevard
Houston, TX 77030

IPLitigate@aol.com
832-434-7157
Party name: Dr. Eric Maidla

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543