Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-766
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-766
Title:Teresa Bierman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Tim Walz, Governor of Minnesota, et al.
Docketed:December 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1244)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 17, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Teresa Bierman, counsel for respondent SEIU and counsel for State respondents Governor Mark Dayton, Emily Johnson Piper and Todd Doncavage have authorize petitioner's counsel to inform the Court that Respondents also grant blanket consent.
Blanket Consent
Jan 15 2019Waiver of right of respondent Tim Walz, Governor of Minnesota, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 16 2019Waiver of right of respondent SEIU Healthcare Minnesota to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Fairness Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Brief amici curiae of NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center of the American Experiment filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 01 2019Response Requested. (Due March 4, 2019)
Feb 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2019 to April 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 3, 2019, for all respondents.
Apr 03 2019Brief of respondent SEIU Healthcare Minnesota in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Brief of respondents Tim Walz, Governor of Minnesota, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 17 2019Reply of petitioners Teresa Bierman, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Teresa Bierman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
6517571010
Party name: Tim Walz, Governor of Minnesota, et al.
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: SEIU Healthcare Minnesota
Other
James Gideon Abernathy
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation, 2403 Pacific Avenue SE
Olympia, WA 98501

JAbernathy@FreedomFoundation.com
360-956-3482
Party name: Freedom Foundation
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Nathan John McGrath
    Counsel of Record
The Fairness Center
500 North Third Street
Floor 2
Harrisburg, PA 17101

nathan@fairnesscenter.org
844.293.1001
Party name: The Fairness Center
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Douglas Paul Seaton
    Counsel of Record
Seaton, Peters and Revnew, P.A.
7300 Metro Boulevard
Suite 500
Minneapolis, MN 55439

dseaton@seatonlaw.com
(952) 896-1700
Party name: CENTER OF THE AMERICAN EXPERIMENT
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
202-314-2061
Party name: NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al.
Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ewilcox@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543