SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-7658 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-7658 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Julius Darius Jones, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:
January 30, 2019
Linked with 18A641
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
Case Numbers:
(PCD-2017-1313)
Decision Date:
September 28, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2018
Application (18A641) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 27, 2018 to January 26, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Dec 18 2018
Application (18A641) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 28, 2019.
Jan 25 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 1, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Proof of Service
Proof of Service
Feb 28 2019
Brief of respondent State of Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 14 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Mar 14 2019
Reply of petitioner Julius Darius Jones filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 01 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amanda Christine Bass
Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender, District of Arizona, Capital Habeas Unit
850 West Adams Street, Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007
amanda_bass@fd.org
602-382-2734
Party name: Julius Darius Jones
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Crabb
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: State of Oklahoma
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##