Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7652
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7652
Title:Brian Anderson, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:January 29, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(17CA1349)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 17, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 28, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2019Waiver of right of respondent State of Colorado to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 19 2019Response Requested. (Due March 21, 2019)
Mar 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2019 to May 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Anderson#64193
Sterling Correctional Facility
PO Box 6000
Sterling, CO 80751

Party name: Brian Anderson
Attorneys for Respondent
L. Andrew Cooper Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203

andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: State of Colorado

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543