Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-750
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-750
Title:JTEKT Corporation, Petitioner
v.
GKN Automotive Ltd.
Docketed:December 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1828)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Askeladden, L.L.C. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2019Brief of respondent GKN Automotive, Ltd. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 06 2019Rescheduled.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Wilbur Todd Baker
    Counsel of Record
Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, LLP
1940 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

tbaker@oblon.com
703-412-6383
Party name: JTEKT CORPORATION
Attorneys for Respondent
Linda Dupont Mettes
    Counsel of Record
Brooks Kushman P.C.
1000 Town Center, 22nd Floor
Southfield, MI 48075

linda_mettes@yahoo.com
2483584400
Party name: GKN AUTOMOTIVE LTD.
Other
Charles Robert Macedo
    Counsel of Record
Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

cmacedo@arelaw.com
2123368074
Party name: ASKELADDEN L.L.C.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543