Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-747
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-747
Title:Sonja Ritter, Petitioner
v.
Lois Brady, Chapter 7 Trustee
Docketed:December 11, 2018
Linked with 18A280
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-60064)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 15 2018Application (18A280) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 11, 2018 to December 10, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Application (18A280) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 10, 2018.
Dec 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Honorable Eugene Wedoff, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Margaret Howard.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Honorable Eugene Wedoff, et al. GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Margaret Howard GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Sonja Ritter
Other
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20005

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-4336
Party name: Honorable Eugene Wedoff, et al.
Timothy C. MacDonnell
    Counsel of Record
Washington and Lee School of Law
#1 Denny Circle
Washington and Lee School of Law Black Lung Clinic
Lexington, VA 24450

macdonnellt@wlu.edu
540-458-8224
Party name: Professor Margaret Howard

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543