Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7451
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7451
Vide 18-936
Title:Shane Cox, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3034)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 15, 2019 to March 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2019.
Mar 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2019 to April 17, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 17, 2019.
Apr 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2019 to May 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2019.
May 01 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 17 2019Reply of petitioner Shane Cox filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Tyler Hansmeier
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office for the District of Kansas
500 State Avenue
Suite 201
Kansas City, KS 66101

daniel_hansmeier@fd.org
913-551-6712
Party name: Shane Cox
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543