Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7449
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7449
Title:Joel Darnell Patton, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10942)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 13 2019Response Requested. (Due March 15, 2019)
Mar 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2019 to April 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2019.
Mar 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2019.
May 15 2019Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 29 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
May 29 2019Reply of petitioner Joel Darnell Patton filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition DENIED.
Jul 02 2019Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 11 2019DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 05 2019Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Matthew Wright
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
500 S. Taylor
Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79109

matthew_wright@fd.org
8063242370
Party name: Joel Darnell Patton
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543