Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-740
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-740
Title:Moath Hamza Ahmed al-Alwi, Petitioner
v.
Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2018
Linked with 18A406
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5067)
   Decision Date:August 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2018Application (18A406) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 5, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Oct 18 2018Application (18A406) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 5, 2018.
Dec 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2019 to February 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 11, 2019.
Feb 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 11, 2019 to March 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 13, 2019.
Mar 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2019 to April 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2019.
Apr 03 2019Brief of respondents Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 16 2019Reply of petitioner Moath Hamza Ahmed al-Alwi filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Breyer respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ramzi Kassem
    Counsel of Record
Main Street Legal Services, Inc.
City University of New York School of Law
2 Court Square
Long Island City, NY 11101

ramzi.kassem@law.cuny.edu
(718) 340-4558
Party name: Moath Hamza Ahmed al-Alwi
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543