Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-733
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-733
Title:1A Auto, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Michael Sullivan, Director, Massachusetts Office of Campaign and Political Finance
Docketed:December 10, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-12413)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, 1A Auto, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Fiscal Alliance Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 30 2019Response Requested. (Due March 1, 2019)
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2019 to April 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
J. H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: 1A Auto, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
William Whitney Porter
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

bill.porter@state.ma.us
617-727-2200
Party name: Michael Sullivan, Director, Massachusetts Office of Campaign and Political Finance
Other
Thaddeus Alan Heuer
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag, LLP
155 Seaport Blvd
Boston, MA 02210

theuer@foleyhoag.com
6178321000
Party name: Fiscal Alliance Foundation
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1200
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
8169315559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 South LaSalle Street, Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: Liberty Justice Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543