Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7286
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7286
Title:Johnathan Masters, Petitioner
v.
Kentucky
Docketed:January 8, 2019
Linked with 18A456
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2015-CA-001755-DG)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 8, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2018Application (18A456) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 6, 2018 to January 5, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 30 2018Application (18A456) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 7, 2019.
Jan 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 7, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOther
Jan 15 2019Waiver of right of respondent Commonwealth of Kentucky to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 04 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Student Press Law Center, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Student Press Law Center, et al. GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Gerhart Landon
    Counsel of Record
Kentucky Department of Public Advocacy
5 Mill Creek Park, Section 100
Frankfort, KY 40601

John.Landon@ky.gov
7325390614
Party name: Johnathan Masters
Attorneys for Respondent
James Havey
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1024 Capital Center Drive
Frankfort, KY 40601

james.havey@ky.gov
5026965498
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Other
Clay Calvert
    Counsel of Record
University of Florida
2060 Weimer Hall
PO Box 118400
Gainesville, FL 32611

ccalvert@jou.ufl.edu
5129069226
Party name: Student Press Law Center, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543