Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-726
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-726
Title:Linda H. Lamone, et al., Appellants
v.
O. John Benisek, et al.
Docketed:December 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(1:13-cv-03233-JKB)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due January 7, 2019)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees John Benisek, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Opposition to motion of appellants Linda Lamone, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOtherOther
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by David Trone. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by David Trone GRANTED.
Jan 04 2019Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. The case will be set for argument in the March argument session.
Jan 08 2019Appellants' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Friday, February 8, 2019. Appellees' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Monday, March 4, 2019. Reply briefs on the merits are to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellants or in support of neither party are to be filed on or before Tuesday, February 12, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellees are to be filed on or before Friday, March 8, 2019.
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
Jan 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Linda Lamone, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, John Benisek, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 08 2019Joint appendix (5 volumes) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Feb 08 2019Brief of appellants Linda Lamone, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of David Orentlicher filed (also in 18-422).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Representative David Trone filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie in support of neither party filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of The Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 04 2019Brief of appellees John Benisek, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Amicus brief of Robert Lee Stone, Jr., and John Harvard Lomax, Jr. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Robert Lee Stone, Jr., and John Harvard Lomax, Jr. filed. (March 8, 2018). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Stephen M. Shapiro filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of First Amendment and Election Law Scholars filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Amicus brief of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression not accepted for filing. (March 11, 2019)
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Group of Current and Former Members of the House of Representatives filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Senator Sheldon Whitehouse filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Political Science Professors filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of the American Jewish Committee filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars Michael C. Dorf, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Governors Arnold Schwarzenegger and Lawrence Joseph Hogan, Jr. filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of the American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Historians filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Michael Kang filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Mathematicians, Law Professors, and Students filed (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2019Amicus brief of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief submitted).
Mar 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression filed (March 18, 2019) (also in 18-422). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Reply of appellants Linda Lamone, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2019Argued. For appellants: Steven M. Sullivan, Solicitor General, Baltimore, Md. For appellees: Michael B. Kimberly, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Steven Marshall Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Maryland
200 St. Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

ssullivan@oag.state.md.us
410-576-6325
Party name: Linda Lamone, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: John Benisek, et al.
Other
Floyd Abrams
    Counsel of Record
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
80 Pine Street
New York, NY 10005

fabrams@cahill.com
212-701-3621
Party name: Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression
Glenn Ephraim Bushel
    Counsel of Record
Tydings & Rosenberg LLP
One East Pratt Street
Suite 901
Baltimore, MD 21202

gbushel@tydingslaw.com
410-752-9718
Party name: Robert Lee Stone, Jr., and John Harvard Lomax, Jr.
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
    Counsel of Record
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

ACepedaDerieux@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, NEW YORK CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, ACLU OF NORTH CAROLINA, AND ACLU OF MARYLAND
Richard Wayland Clary
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
Worldwide Plaza
New York, NY 10019

rclary@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: Historians
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jon M. Greenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, NW
9th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
202-662-8315
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Mathematicians, Law Professors, and Students
David Edward Leit
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein Sandler, LLP
One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07068

dleit@lowenstein.com
9735972340
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, et al.
Justin Michael Levitt
    Counsel of Record
Loyola Law School
919 Albany Street
Los Angeles, CA 90015

justin.levitt@lls.edu
213-736-7417
Party name: NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC., et al.
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Stephen M. Shapiro
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Senator Sheldon Whitehouse
Gary Michael Parsons Jr.
    Counsel of Record
245 Sullivan Street
New York, NY 10012

michael.parsons@nyu.edu
212-992-8196
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.
Bradley S. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

brad.phillips@mto.com
213-683-9100
Party name: FIRST AMENDMENT AND ELECTION LAW SCHOLARS
Richard A. Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

rrosen@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: THE AMERICAN JEWISH COMMITTEE
James Paul Rouhandeh
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk and Wardwell
450 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10017

james.rouhandeh@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Professor Michael Kang
David Abba Schwarz
    Counsel of Record
Irell & Manella LLP
1800 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA 90067

dschwarz@irell.com
310-277-1010
Party name: GOVERNORS ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER AND LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN JR.
Brian Adair Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 2nd Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

bsutherland@reedsmith.com
4156594843
Party name: Political Science Professors Allison P. Harris, et al.
Anne Margaret Voigts
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
601 S. California Ave., Ste. 100
Palo Alto, CA 94304

avoigts@kslaw.com
(650) 422-6710
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars Michael C. Dorf, Joshua S. Sellers, Andrew M. Siegel, and Joseph T. Thai
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Bipartisan Group of Current and Former Members of the House of Representatives
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar and Scott LLP
54 W. Hubbard Street
Chicago, IL 60654

adam.mortara@bartlit-beck.com
7737507154
Party name: The Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly
William James Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
100 East Pratt Street
Suite 2440
Baltimore, MD 21202-1031

wmurphy@zuckerman.com
410-332-0444
Party name: David Trone
David Orentlicher
    Counsel of Record
UNLV William S. Boyd School of Law
4505 S. Maryland Parkway
Box 451003
Las Vegas, NV 89154-1003

dorentli@gmail.com
702-895-2333
Party name: David Orentlicher
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543