Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7195
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7195
Title:Eduardo Gomez, Petitioner
v.
Illinois
Docketed:December 28, 2018
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Illinois, First District
   Case Numbers:(1-15-0605)
   Decision Date:April 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 26, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jan 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent People State of Illinois to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Edward Koch
    Counsel of Record
Office the State Appellate Defender
203 North LaSalle Street, 24th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

brian.koch@osad.state.il.us
(312) 814-5472
Party name: Eduardo Gomez
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Marc Glick
    Counsel of Record
Illinois Attorney General's Office
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

mglick@atg.state.il.us
3128142232
Party name: People State of Illinois

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543