Dec 19 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 28, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service |
Jan 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2019 to February 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 28 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 27, 2019. |
| |
Feb 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2019 to March 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 29, 2019. |
| |
Mar 19 2019 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Willis Wheeler filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2029 to April 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 5, 2019. |
| |
Apr 05 2019 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Certificate of Word CountMain Document |
Apr 16 2019 | Reply of petitioner Willis Wheeler filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Apr 24 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019. |
| |
May 13 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019. |
| |
May 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019. |
| |
May 28 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019. |
| |
Jun 03 2019 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for the court to consider the First Step Act of 2018, Pub. L. No. 115-391 (2018). |
| |
Jul 05 2019 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |